Use coupon code TOP15 on all courses

Link

Squaring Technique to speed up calculations

Many readers have requested me to teach them a simple method to square two and three digit numbers. In bank exams calculation speed is very crucial. So today I have decided to explain my Squaring technique.

Technique

In case of two digit number deduct last digit and add it to another number and then add square of same.

In this technique we simplify the squaring method by making one unit's digit zero. It is far easy to multiply 50*24 than 54*24. So I used this technique. Try practice more to become expert in this technique.

Let's take some examples 


Find square of 53.
=(53*53)
= (53+3) * (53-3) + (3*3)
=(56*50) + 9
= (560*5) + 9
= 2800 + 9 = 2809   

Let's take another example 
Find square of 69
= (69*69)
= (69+1) * (69-1) + (1*1)
= (70*68) + 1
= (680*7) + 1
= 4761

Let's take one more example
Find square of 45
= (45*45)
= (45-5)*(45+5) + (5*5)
= (40*50) + 25
= 2000+25
= 2025

Comment below in case you find any problem in this technique.
bankexamstoday-banner
Join 40,000+ readers and get free notes in your email