Multiplication Tricks - Find solution within 20 seconds

Today I am going to share quick multiplication tricks that will help you find the solution within 20 seconds. Must read - 10 Coolest Maths tricks

Multiply by 9,99,999,etc...

56*99=5544
Step 1:Place a zero at the end for each 9 :5600
Step 2 : Subtract the original number from Step 1 like this 5600-56=5544
vedic maths multiplication tricks

Multiply by 125

68*125=8500
Step 1 :Place three zeros at the end of the number :68000
Step 2: Divide the number from Step 1  by 8:68000/8=8500

64*125 is the same as :
32*250 is the same as
16*500 is the same as 
8*1000

64*125
Step 1. Each time you just need to pick 125 multiply it by 8 will get 1000
Step 2. Pick 64 and divide it by 8 will get 8
Step 3. Multiply the results with each other 8* 1000 
Hence Solution is 8000
[Hint: Just remember 125*8=1000]

Multiply two digits numbers ending in 1

51*31=1581
Step 1: Multiply the left most digits : 5*3=15
Step 2: Add the left most digits:5+3=8
Step 3: Places the result from Step 2 next to the result from Step 1:158
Step 4 : Places 1 next to the result from  Step 3 : 1581


multiplication trick

Multiplication Tricks

Multiply numbers between 11 and 19

14*18=252
Step 1: Add the larger  number to the right most digit of the other number:18+4=22
Step 2: Put a 0 at the end of the result from step 1:220
Step 3 :Multiply the right most digits of both original numbers : 8*4=32
Step 4:Add Step 2 and step 3 :220+32=252
multiplication trick

Multiply two digit number by 11

53*11=583
Step 1: Add the both digts of the two digit number:5+3=8
Step 2: Place the result in between both digits : 583

59*11=649
Step 1: 5+9=14
Step 2 : Carry the 1 when the result is greater than 9:5+1=6
Step 3: 649
multiplication trick

Multiply by 5

 1234 *5 =6170
Step 1 : Divide  the number by 2 :1234/2=617
Step 2: Multiply  the result from Step 1 by 10 : 617*10=6170

Multiply by 25

 18*25=450
Step 1: Divide  the number by 4:18/4
Step 2: Multiply  the number from Step 1 by 100: 4.5 * 100 = 450

Multiply by 9

56*9=504
Step 1: Multiply the number by 10: 56*10=560
Step 2: Subtract the original number from Step 1: 560-56=504

Factorization

By Factoring number,you can break down problems into simpler multiplication tasks.Also,you may be able to apply some techniques you learned.

21*33
step 1 : 21*11*3
Step 2: 231*3
Step 3 :693

67*81
Step 1: 67*9*9
Step 2:603*9=5427

28*125=3500
Step 1: 28*125
Step 2: 28*25*5
Step 3:28*(100/4)*5
Step 4:28/4*100*5
Step 5:7*500=3500

Some Special type

When sum of unit digit is 10 and remaining digit is same.

43×47 = 4 × ( 4+1 ) / 3×7
= 4×5/21
20/21
Ans = 2021

72×78 = 7×8 / 2×8
= 56/16
Ans = 5616

104 × 106 = 10× ( 10+1 ) / 4×6
= 10 × 11/24
= 110/24
Ans = 11024

When sum of ten's digit is 10 and unit digit is same

46 × 66
= ( 4×6 ) +6 / 6×6
= 24 + 6/36
= 30/ 36
Ans = 3036

83 × 23
= ( 8×2 ) +3 / 3×3
= 19/09
Ans = 1909

92 × 12
= ( 9×1 ) + 2/2 × 2
= 11/04
Ans = 1104

When unit digit is 5 in both the numbers and difference between both number is 10.

75 × 65
=  6 × ( 7+1 ) / 75
=  48/75
Ans = 4875

45 × 35
= 3 × ( 4+1 )/75
= 15 /75
Ans = 1575

105 × 95
= 9 × ( 10+1 ) / 75
= 99/75
Ans = 9975

Find the unit digit  of 147128 * 138148 ?

Shortcut for Multiplication digit ends with 1

Updated on 12th October 2015

Multiply by 11,111,1111....so on

Ques 1. 111111111 ✘ 111111111 = ?
Sol:
No of digits in multiplier = 9
Write in ascending order from left side like this:
987654321
and now 9-1=8
write it in descending order just after it
12345678
now you will get like this:
12345678987654321
hence
111111111111111111 = 12345678987654321


Multiplication tricks for large numbers
long digit multiplication
Ques 2. 1111111111 ✘ 1111111111 = ?
Sol:
No of digits in multiplier =10
Write in ascending order from left side like this:
10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1
and now 10-1=9
write it in descending order just after it
1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9
and after it just add the carry
1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8/ 9/ 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1
                  8+1/   9+1 / 0
1 2 3 4 5 6 7 9 0 0 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1
now you will get like this:
1234567900987654321
hence
1111111111✘1111111111 = 1234567900987654321
Multiplication tricks Easy shortcut Methods
Easy multiplication tricks for same numbers
Ques 3. 11111112222222 = ?
Sol:
No of digit in the multiplier is 7 then let n=7;
Now Just multiply the digit 2 from 1 to 7 time & arrange them from extreme left to right in ascending order,you will get like this:
14 12 10 8 6 4 2
and now just subtract one from n.like this n=7,so n-1=6.
Multiply the digit 2 from 1 to 6 time & arrange them from just right after it,you will get like this:
2 4 6 8 10 12
Now placing both outcome like this & add the carry
2 4 6 8 10 12 14 12 10 8 6 4 2
        8+1/0+1/2+1/4+1/2+1
You will get the answer:
2 4 6 9 1 3 5 3 0 8 6 4 2

Ques 4. 1111111✘5555555 = ?
Sol:
No of digit = 7
Now Just multiply the digit 5 from 1 to 7 time & arrange them from extreme left to right in ascending order,you will get like this:
35 30 25 20 15 10 5
Just right after it perform same action but in descending order & till 6 times only.like this:
5 10 15 20 25 30
Now placing together ,just add the carry
5 10 15 20 25 30 35 30 25 20 15 10 5
6 1 7 2 8 3 8 2 7 1 6 0 5
11111115555555=6172838271605
Mulitply 22 by 44 tricks and easy Method





bankexamstoday-banner

Smart Prep Kit for Banking Exams by Ramandeep Singh - Download here


Join 40,000+ readers and get free notes in your email

57 comments:

  1. thnku sir....

    ReplyDelete
  2. thanks sir:)

    ReplyDelete
  3. thank u sir..
    Sir any idea about Lakshmi vilas bank PO exam??

    ReplyDelete
  4. Watz der n a nameJune 2, 2015 at 5:44 PM

    Thanku soo much sir...really this wll save time!!!thanks alot

    ReplyDelete
  5. sir, we are paying a lot of thanks to u.

    ReplyDelete
  6. Appreciate ur all round dedication .....

    ReplyDelete
  7. Great sir
    thanks a lot!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!

    ReplyDelete
  8. great sir thank u:)

    ReplyDelete
  9. Hmmmmm...yaha ho.. ab :)))

    ReplyDelete
  10. sir when u r uploading tricks for allegation and mixture

    ReplyDelete
  11. second trick is so easy and very useful, and i was looking for such a trick. Thank you sir.

    ReplyDelete
  12. Not getting proper answer in NUMBER ENDING IN 1

    Example:

    51 × 61

    Step 1 - 5 × 6 = 30
    Step 2 - 5 + 6 = 11

    Step 3 - 3011 from above steps
    Step 4 - now placing 1 at last on step 3 - 30111

    But ans is 51 × 61 = 3111

    ReplyDelete
  13. Correct way of solving NUMBER ENDING IN 1 IS
    EXAMPLE-
    1ST) 41 × 31
    STEP 1 : 4 × 3 = 12
    STEP 2: 4 + 3 = 7
    STEP 3: PLACE 0 AT RESULT OF STEP 1; 120
    AND PLACE 0 BEFORE THE RESULT OF STEP 2; 07
    NOW ADD BOTH 120 + 07 = 127
    STEP 4 : NOW PLACE 1 AT RESULT OF STEP 3:
    1271

    RESULT OF 41 × 31 = 1271

    CHECK UR METHOD U WILL GET WRONG ANSWER

    ReplyDelete
  14. When bank of baroda pgdbm interview call letter upload.do you have any idea about it.please reply it.

    ReplyDelete
  15. Hello ramandeep g I m selected in syndicate bank po...I want home posting should I apply for haryana gramin bank as office assistant

    ReplyDelete
  16. After how much I will promoted to officer scale 1 in haryana gramin bank

    ReplyDelete
  17. Ankit 300+11 is 311 not 3011

    ReplyDelete
  18. According to ur given steps. In step 3, we have to place the results from step 2 next to the results from step 1, not to add them.. please read ur given steps.. carefully

    ReplyDelete
  19. According to above steps .. in step 3 we have to place result from step 2.. to next of result of step 1.. not to add them.. according to ur given steps.. please read ur given steps..

    ReplyDelete
  20. multiply by 5 example should be 1234 and not 12345 ....right ? :)

    ReplyDelete
  21. u did not carry forward the 1 from 5+6=11..so u got wrong ans

    ReplyDelete
  22. hi sir. how come 138^48 is equal to 6^48?

    ReplyDelete
  23. i couldn't understand unit digit question n sol.,plz elaborate it how this 6 came

    ReplyDelete
  24. nice trick sir... thanks a lot...

    ReplyDelete
  25. Hi,I am also unable to understand this method..Try this method
    147^128*138^148=?
    Consider the unit digits of 147 & 138..i.e) 7 & 8
    Now,7^1=7
    7^2=9(7*7=49,take only unit place)
    7^3=3
    7^4=1
    7^5=7,7^6=9(the process repeats for every four steps..
    Likewise,take the unit digit of 138..i.e)8
    8^1=8
    8^2=4
    8^3=2
    8^4=6(this process repeats)
    Now,1st part..147^128==>7^128(take only unit place)
    since both the powers of 7 and 8 takes 4 steps and then the process is repeating..we can divide the powers by 4..
    Check whether 128 is divisible by 4....yes,it is divisible..
    So,7^4=1...So,the unit place of 147^128 is 1..
    Now 138^148 can be taken as 8^148
    148 is also divisible by 4...So,8^4=6,===>unit place of 138^148=6
    therefore,147^128*138^148===>1*6=6
    So,the answer is 6 : )

    ReplyDelete
  26. Ya thank u I got a mail regarding this..

    ReplyDelete
  27. http://www.bankexamstoday.com/2015/06/unit-digit-shortcut-find-last-digit-of.html

    ReplyDelete
  28. Unit digit multiplication


    http://www.bankexamstoday.com/2015/06/unit-digit-shortcut-find-last-digit-of.html

    ReplyDelete
  29. Plz tell anyone if anybody is in a govt dept then in below column which date will be our To date plzz clarify..in this column which am i presenting

    ReplyDelete
  30. 5425*99=537075.sir pl check it.

    ReplyDelete
  31. sir pls mention with year.little bit confusing wen we look over through heading

    ReplyDelete
  32. sir give me some tips for idbi executive exam

    ReplyDelete
  33. thank u sooo much ramandeep singh sir

    ReplyDelete
  34. sorry sir, there is an additional zero in the first problem.

    ReplyDelete
  35. why there is mistakes in the handwritten notes

    ReplyDelete
  36. In the first example, 537075 is the answer.
    In the second example, 622611 is the answer.

    ReplyDelete

Thanks for commenting. Follow us on Telegram. Search BankExamsToday