3 Step Multiplication Trick - A shortcut method

Help me to Share!
In the series of providing quantitative shortcuts and tricks, today I come up with multiplication trick.

While doing multiplication of a two digit number with another two digit number, we take at least 6 steps. Try yourself. Multiply 62 with 32. 

Now let's do this with a trick

Step 1

First step is same as conventional method, here we multiply 2 with 2.
multiplication shortcut step 1

Step 2

This is an interesting step. Now multiply last digit first value and first digit of second value and vice-versa. Then we add outcomes. But we need the last number that is 8 here.
multiplication shortcut step 2

 Step 3 

This is the last step, in this step we do multiplication ten's digit of both value and add the remainder from previous calculation. That's it, we completed the calculation in 3 steps instead of six steps.
multiplication shortcut step 2

We can use this method for multiplication of three or even four digit numbers but time management is really important in IBPS exam and other recruitment exams so for longer calculations, estimation is the best trick. I will post an article about how to do long calculations using estimation and result is 95% accurate which is enough to arrive at answer.

Update 06-09-2013

As two of the readers namely Rahul and Ansh have requested me to use this technique in longer calculations multiplications. I am updating this article.

Multiplication of 3 digit numbers

In this example I will multiply 432 with 346. Now the 3 step multiplication method will become 5 step. This method can be used for 4 and even 5 digit numbers but as in bank exams there is lack of time available for calculations I recommend you to use approximation for long calculations.

Step 1


Step 2


Step 3


Step 4


Step 5




In case you find any difficulty to understand the above multiplication method then ask your question in the comments. I will try to answer every query asap. 

33 comments:

  1. Thank you for this sooperb tricks..I tried for 3 digit to 2 digit numbers. But i din get the answer. Help me in this regard ..

    ReplyDelete
  2. In IBPS you won't have time to make such calculations. Use estimation technique

    ReplyDelete
  3. HII...FOR 3 DIGIT NUMBER HOW CAN WE REMEMBER THESE MANY STEPS TO BE MANDATORY FOLLOWED??

    ReplyDelete
    Replies
    1. why you are so dumb divya!

      Delete
  4. Yes it will be applicable

    ReplyDelete
  5. Dear Raman,
    I am very happy and thankful for these nice tricks..but please also give a trick to "multiply 2 digit number with 3 digit number(and more)"..weather this trick is applicable for those multiplication?

    ReplyDelete
    Replies
    1. I think this is bakwas trick..........Simple multiplication method is best method...... & No confusion.

      Delete
  6. Please look at above examples. I did that.

    ReplyDelete
  7. @rahul I have updated the article. This is not estimation, this a vedic maths trick. Please share this article on Facebook and Twitter as I made lots of efforts for you. In case you are confused about any topic, please leave a reply, will try to write about that topic.

    ReplyDelete
  8. veere u said u will post an article on LONG MULTIPLICATION CALCULTION by ESTIMATION..i am waiting..please post quicky..paper sir te hai..kamm kharaab ho jaana

    ReplyDelete
  9. sir when we take 3 digits multiply with 4 digits its is not gonna be solved....

    ReplyDelete
  10. if you like to multiply 3 digit no with 2 digit number you have to add a zero before 2 digit number ex.
    132x079

    ReplyDelete
  11. i like 2 digit short cut answers i learnt from that examples. thank you for that but 3 digit confuse,

    ReplyDelete
  12. Sir pls help solving this nos. 55*65 as asked by MR.amit

    ReplyDelete
  13. 50*60+5*5+60*5+50*5=3575

    ReplyDelete
  14. thanks for tricks

    ReplyDelete
  15. does the above trick, told by anonymous, is specific????
    coz it does not work for 91*76

    ReplyDelete
    Replies
    1. 6*1='6'
      9*6+7*1=6'1' (6 carry forwrd)
      9*7+6='69'
      =6916. (It works)

      Delete
  16. is there anyone who can tell about multiplication of 4 digit no with 3 digit no

    ReplyDelete
  17. Thank u so much..i was very much confused..now set..

    ReplyDelete
  18. all first 18 people are dumbasses... dont try...u peoplewont get through
    its so easily explained.. no one can spoonfeed you all

    ReplyDelete
  19. it does not work for 55*54

    ReplyDelete
    Replies
    1. 5*4=20 0 carry forward 2
      2+5*4+5*5=47 70 carry forward 4
      4+5*5=29 = 2970 is the answer ....check it again buddy

      Delete
  20. hai i am priya i couldn't understand this 3 digit multiplication ple explain me clearly

    ReplyDelete
  21. this is not use for ibps exam

    ReplyDelete
  22. from left onwards u just need to remember for 3 digits |*|.

    ReplyDelete
  23. thanks your very much sir this short thick is very nice.

    ReplyDelete
  24. How to cal 2176* 316 with this trick

    ReplyDelete
  25. Thank u so much for this tricks. nd its working on all the values. thank u so much sir....

    ReplyDelete
  26. This is not more useful for ibps. use simple calculation is less time taking as comparison to above tricks.

    ReplyDelete

Thanks for commenting. It's very difficult to answer every query here, it's better to post your query on IBPSToday.com